ID H0358 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 38 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 38 Effective: 01/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise property tax law to authorize the county auditor to notify various political subdivisions and to provide valuation statements the third Monday of July.
Title
Amends existing law to revise property tax law to authorize the county auditor to notify various political subdivisions and to provide valuation statements the third Monday of July.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 38 Effective: 01/01/12 | |
2012-03-06 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/05 | |
2012-03-05 | To Governor | |
2012-03-02 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-01 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-02-29 | to enrol | |
2012-02-29 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-29 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 | |
2012-02-28 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt engros | |
2012-02-24 | to engros | |
2012-02-24 | House concurred in Senate amens | |
2012-02-24 | House Held at Desk | |
2012-02-23 | to House | |
2012-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-23 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 32-0-2 | |
2012-02-10 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-10 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-09 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-09 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-08 | to 1st rdg as amen | |
2012-02-08 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-02-02 | to 14th Ord | |
2012-02-02 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-24 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-01-24 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-24 | Senate intro | |
2012-01-23 | to Senate | |
2012-01-23 | Title apvd | |
2012-01-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-0-2 | |
2012-01-19 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-01-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-18 | rec d/p | |
2012-01-18 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-13 | to Rev/Tax | |
2012-01-13 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-12 | to printing | |
2012-01-12 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-12 | House intro |