ID H0354 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2018 Session Law Chapter 10 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2018 Session Law Chapter 10 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
UNIFORM CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES -- Amends existing law to provide that opioid antagonists dispensed for humans shall be filed with the board electronically.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that opioid antagonists dispensed for humans shall be filed with the board electronically.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2018 Session Law Chapter 10 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-02-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 16, 2018 |
2018-02-16 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-02-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-02-12 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-01-29 | House | to Senate |
2018-01-29 | House | Title apvd |
2018-01-29 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2018-01-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |