ID H0351 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Read second time; filed for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MEDICAID -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the establishment of Medicaid reimbursement payment methods and to provide for a temporary reduction in certain reimbursements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the establishment of Medicaid reimbursement payment methods and to provide for a temporary reduction in certain reimbursements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-02-11SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2020-02-06SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-05Houseto Senate
2020-02-05HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-05HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 44-24-2
2020-02-04HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-03HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-01-23HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback