ID H0350 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2023 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 04/04/2023 SECTION 17; 07/01/2023 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- HEALTH AND WELFARE -- BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Division of Behavioral Services for fiscal years 2023 and 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Division of Behavioral Services for fiscal years 2023 and 2024.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2023 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 04/04/2023 SECTION 17; 07/01/2023 all other SECTIONS
2023-03-30HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on March 30, 2023
2023-03-30HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2023-03-29SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2023-03-29SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2023-03-28HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2023-03-28HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2023-03-28Senateto House
2023-03-28SenateTitle apvd
2023-03-28SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 18-17-0
2023-03-27SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2023-03-24SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2023-03-24SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2023-03-24SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2023-03-23Houseto Senate
2023-03-23HouseTitle apvd
2023-03-23HouseRules Suspended:
2023-03-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2023-03-22HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2023-03-21HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback