ID H0350 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2018 Session Law Chapter 59 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COUNSELORS AND THERAPISTS -- Amends existing law to revise licensure requirements for marriage and family therapists and associate marriage and family therapists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise licensure requirements for marriage and family therapists and associate marriage and family therapists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2018 Session Law Chapter 59 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-09HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:21 a.m. on March 8, 2018
2018-03-08HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-07SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-07SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-06HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-06HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-05Senateto House
2018-03-05SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-05SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-02-28SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-16SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2018-02-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-01-31Houseto Senate
2018-01-31HouseTitle apvd
2018-01-31HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-1-0
2018-01-30HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-01-29HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-17HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback