ID H0347 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BOND ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the holding of another bond election after a voter rejection.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the holding of another bond election after a voter rejection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-01-30 | House | to Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Title apvd |
2020-01-30 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 48-21-1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |