ID H0345 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 10, 2020 Session Law Chapter 84 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 10, 2020 Session Law Chapter 84 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES -- Amends existing law to provide that certain vehicles shall not be subject to removal or booting.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain vehicles shall not be subject to removal or booting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 10, 2020 Session Law Chapter 84 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 10, 2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-04 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-1-1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-11 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-11 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 61-8-1 |
2020-02-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 10, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |