ID H0344 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding voter identification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding voter identification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2021-04-13SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-04-12Houseto Senate
2021-04-12HouseTitle apvd
2021-04-12HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 56-12-2
2021-04-12HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-04-09HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-04-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-04-06HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2021-03-18HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback