ID H0344 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 299 Effective: 04/11/11 Sections 2, 3 & 4; 07/01/11 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 299 Effective: 04/11/11 Sections 2, 3 & 4; 07/01/11 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law relating to fiscal matters of school districts providing provisions relating to certain maintenance match moneys for the maintenance and repair of certain student-occupied buildings; to revise provisions relating to the board of trustees of each school district's preparation of a budget; to revise provisions relating to certain plant facilities levy and to revise provisions relating to the first tax year of conversion.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law relating to fiscal matters of school districts providing provisions relating to certain maintenance match moneys for the maintenance and repair of certain student-occupied buildings; to revise provisions relating to the board of trustees of each school district's preparation of a budget; to revise provisions relating to certain plant facilities levy and to revise provisions relating to the first tax year of conversion.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 299 Effective: 04/11/11 Sections 2, 3 & 4; 07/01/11 All other sections | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/08 | |
2011-04-07 | To Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-07 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-07 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-07 | To enrol | |
2011-04-07 | to House | |
2011-04-07 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-07 | Goedde | |
2011-04-07 | 35-0-0 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McGee, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Schmidt, Siddoway, Smyser, Stegner, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor | |
2011-04-07 | PASSED | |
2011-04-07 | Rls susp | |
2011-04-07 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-04-07 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-06 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-06 | rec d/p | |
2011-04-06 | Rpt out | |
2011-04-06 | to Educ | |
2011-04-06 | 1st rdg | |
2011-04-06 | Senate intro | |
2011-04-06 | to Senate | |
2011-04-06 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-06 | Nonini | |
2011-04-06 | 68-1-1 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb(McCoy), Burgoyne, Chadderdon(Chadderdon), Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs(Wheeler), Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Ringo Absent and excused -- Barrett Floor Sponsor | |
2011-04-06 | PASSED | |
2011-04-06 | Rls susp | |
2011-04-06 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-06 | rec d/p | |
2011-04-06 | Rpt out | |
2011-04-05 | to Educ | |
2011-04-05 | Rpt prt | |
2011-04-04 | to printing | |
2011-04-04 | 1st rdg | |
2011-04-04 | House intro |