ID H0343 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 16, 2021 Session Law Chapter 251 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 16, 2021 Session Law Chapter 251 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- SUPREME COURT -- Relates to the appropriation to the Supreme Court for fiscal year 2022.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Supreme Court for fiscal year 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 16, 2021 Session Law Chapter 251 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:05 a.m. on April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-04-12 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-04-07 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2021-04-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |