ID H0342 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2020 Session Law Chapter 114 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

TELEHEALTH -- Amends existing law to define “telehealth technologies” and to revise provisions regarding telehealth services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to define “telehealth technologies” and to revise provisions regarding telehealth services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2020 Session Law Chapter 114 Effective: 07/01/2020
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 11, 2020
2020-03-11HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2020-03-10SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2020-03-10SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2020-03-09HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2020-03-06Houseto enrol
2020-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-06HouseRules Suspended:
2020-03-06HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2020-03-05HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-05HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2020-03-04HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2020-03-04HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2020-03-04HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Health & Welfare for concurrence recommendation
2020-03-03HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2020-03-02Senateto House
2020-03-02SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-02SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 32-0-3
2020-02-27SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2020-02-26SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2020-02-26SenateAmendments reported printed
2020-02-25SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2020-02-25SenateAmendments ordered printed
2020-02-25SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2020-02-13SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2020-02-06SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-05Houseto Senate
2020-02-05HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-05HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2020-02-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-02-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-01-31HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-01-30HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-01-21HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2020-01-20HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback