ID H0340 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2018 Session Law Chapter 36 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES -- Amends and repeals existing law to revise provisions regarding controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and repeals existing law to revise provisions regarding controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2018 Session Law Chapter 36 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-02HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 1, 2018
2018-03-01HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-02-28SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-02-27HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-02-26HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-02-23Senateto House
2018-02-23SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-23SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-02-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2018-02-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-01-31Houseto Senate
2018-01-31HouseTitle apvd
2018-01-31HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2018-01-30HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-01-29HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-17HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback