ID H0339 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MASK MANDATES -- Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding the prohibition of mask mandates.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding the prohibition of mask mandates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-04-14 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-14 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 47-22-1 |
2021-04-14 | House | Read third time in full as amended |
2021-04-13 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-12 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2021-04-09 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2021-04-09 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-18 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders, no objection |
2021-03-18 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2021-03-18 | House | Previously Read in Full |
2021-03-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |