ID H0335 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on January 31, 2018 Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EMPLOYMENT SECURITY LAW -- Amends existing law to revise the calculation of the taxable wage rate by reducing the fund size multiplier and to provide for the issuance of adjusted taxable wage rates by the director under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the calculation of the taxable wage rate by reducing the fund size multiplier and to provide for the issuance of adjusted taxable wage rates by the director under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-31HouseReported Signed by Governor on January 31, 2018 Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2018
2018-01-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 8:10 a.m. on January 26, 2018
2018-01-26HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-01-25SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-01-25SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-01-25HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-01-24HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-01-23Senateto House
2018-01-23SenateTitle apvd
2018-01-23SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2018-01-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-01-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2018-01-17SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-01-16Houseto Senate
2018-01-16HouseTitle apvd
2018-01-16HouseRls susp -- PASSED 69-0-1
2018-01-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-01-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-12HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-01-11HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback