ID H0318 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 16, 2015 Session Law Chapter 333 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 16, 2015 Session Law Chapter 333 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LIQUOR LICENSES - Amends existing law to provide for the issuance of a liquor license to the owner, operator or lessee of a conference and event center that is within the city limits of a resort city.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the issuance of a liquor license to the owner, operator or lessee of a conference and event center that is within the city limits of a resort city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 16, 2015 Session Law Chapter 333 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-04-10 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:28 a.m. on April 10, 2015 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-04-08 | Senate | to House |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Stennett |
2015-04-08 | Senate | 18-16-1 AYES -- Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, McKenzie, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Souza, Stennett, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- Bair, Bayer, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Lee, Martin, Mortimer, Rice, Siddoway, Thayn, Tippets, Vick Absent and excused -- Schmidt Floor Sponsor |
2015-04-08 | Senate | PASSED |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-31 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-31 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-31 | House | Miller |
2015-03-31 | House | 40-28-2 AYES -- Anderson, Barbieri, Bell, Beyeler, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew(Killen), Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Holtzclaw, Jordan, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Packer, Pence, Perry, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Troy, VanOrden, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Horman, Kerby, Loertscher, Luker, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Palmer, Raybould, Thompson(Mickelsen), Trujillo, Vander Woude Absent -- McMillan, Wills Floor Sponsor |
2015-03-31 | House | PASSED |
2015-03-31 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 68 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 2, read three times |
2015-03-31 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-30 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |