ID H0317 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

OPTOMETRISTS -- Repeals and adds to existing law regarding optometric physicians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals and adds to existing law regarding optometric physicians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2020-02-06SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-05Houseto Senate
2020-02-05HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-05HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 58-11-1
2020-02-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-02-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2020-01-31HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-01-30HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-01-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2020-01-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback