ID H0315 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 13, 2020 Session Law Chapter 13 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 13, 2020 Session Law Chapter 13 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES -- Amends existing law to update Schedule I.
Title
Amends existing law to update Schedule I.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 13, 2020 Session Law Chapter 13 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-02-13 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:11 a.m. on February 12, 2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-02-10 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-02-07 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-01-27 | House | to Senate |
2020-01-27 | House | Title apvd |
2020-01-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 62-5-2 |
2020-01-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 27, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-01-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |