ID H0315 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2013 Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 01/01/13 Sections 1, 2 & 4; 07/01/17 Section 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2013 Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 01/01/13 Sections 1, 2 & 4; 07/01/17 Section 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to establish and revise provisions relating to certain personal property being exempt from taxation and to provide additional procedures and definitions.
Title
Amends existing law to establish and revise provisions relating to certain personal property being exempt from taxation and to provide additional procedures and definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2013 Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 01/01/13 Sections 1, 2 & 4; 07/01/17 Section 3 |
2013-04-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 8:30 a.m. on March 29, 2013 |
2013-03-29 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-27 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-26 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-26 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-03-19 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-19 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-19 | House | Collins, Moyle & Burgoyne |
2013-03-19 | House | 67-2-1 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding(McLean), Eskridge, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Patterson, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Ward-Engelking, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Gannon, Ringo Absent and excused -- Kloc Floor Sponsors |
2013-03-19 | House | PASSED |
2013-03-19 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 66 Nays 2 Abs/Excd 2, read three times |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2013-03-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |