ID H0312 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DAYCARE FACILITIES -- Amends existing law to revise licensing and other requirements for daycare facilities.
Title
Amends existing law to revise licensing and other requirements for daycare facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2020-01-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 23-44-2 |
2020-01-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-01-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 27, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |