ID H0312 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $31,820,000 to the Department of Administration for the Bond Payment Program for fiscal year 2014.
Title
Appropriates $31,820,000 to the Department of Administration for the Bond Payment Program for fiscal year 2014.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-02 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:03 p.m. on April 1, 2013 |
2013-04-01 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-29 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-28 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-27 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-27 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-03-21 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-21 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-21 | House | PASSED -- 67-0-3 |
2013-03-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |