ID H0311 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2023 Session Law Chapter 194 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COMMUNITY COLLEGES -- Amends existing law to allow legislative appropriations for upper divisions in community college districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to allow legislative appropriations for upper divisions in community college districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-31HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2023 Session Law Chapter 194 Effective: 07/01/2023
2023-03-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on March 29, 2023
2023-03-29HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2023-03-28SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2023-03-28SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2023-03-28HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2023-03-28HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2023-03-24Senateto House
2023-03-24SenateTitle apvd
2023-03-24SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 29-3-3
2023-03-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2023-03-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2023-03-17SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2023-03-17SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2023-03-16Houseto Senate
2023-03-16HouseTitle apvd
2023-03-16HouseRules Suspended:
2023-03-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2023-03-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2023-03-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2023-03-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback