ID H0309 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION -- Adds to existing law to establish a source of transportation funding and to create the Economic Reserve and Investment Fund for the purpose of providing moneys for the Strategic Initiatives Program, General Fund revenue shortfalls, and expenses incurred as a result of a disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to establish a source of transportation funding and to create the Economic Reserve and Investment Fund for the purpose of providing moneys for the Strategic Initiatives Program, General Fund revenue shortfalls, and expenses incurred as a result of a disaster.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22HouseU.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
2020-01-17HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 20, 2020
2020-01-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-01-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-01-10HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2020-01-09HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback