ID H0300 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2015 Session Law Chapter 302 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION - Amends existing law to provide that computation of alternative school support units shall include grades 6 through 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that computation of alternative school support units shall include grades 6 through 12.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-09HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2015 Session Law Chapter 302 Effective: 07/01/2016
2015-04-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:25 a.m. on April 7, 2015
2015-04-07HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2015-04-06SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2015-04-06SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2015-04-02HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2015-04-01HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2015-03-31Senateto House
2015-03-31SenateTitle apvd
2015-03-31SenatePatrick
2015-03-31Senate35-0-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor
2015-03-31SenatePASSED
2015-03-31SenateRead in full as required)
2015-03-31SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2015-03-31SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2015-03-30SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2015-03-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2015-03-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2015-03-26Houseto Senate
2015-03-26HouseTitle apvd
2015-03-26HouseClow
2015-03-26House65-0-5 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Chew, Jordan, Perry, Rubel, Wood Floor Sponsor
2015-03-26HousePASSED
2015-03-26HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 63 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 7, read three times
2015-03-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-03-25HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-03-23HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2015-03-20HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback