ID H0300 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - to Jud
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds to and amends existing law to increase certain court filing fees and to provide for remittance of the increase to the Access to Justice Fund; and to provide for what moneys in the Access to Justice Fund may be utilized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to and amends existing law to increase certain court filing fees and to provide for remittance of the increase to the Access to Justice Fund; and to provide for what moneys in the Access to Justice Fund may be utilized.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-04 to Jud
2011-04-04 1st rdg
2011-04-04 Senate intro
2011-04-04 to Senate
2011-04-04 Title apvd
2011-04-04 Bayer
2011-04-04 38-32-0 AYES -- Anderson, Bateman, Bayer, Bilbao, Black, Bolz, Buckner-Webb(McCoy), Burgoyne, Chew, Crane, Cronin, Eskridge, Hagedorn, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Luker, McGeachin, McMillan, Nesset, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Shepherd, Shirley, Smith(30), Smith(24), Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(35) NAYS -- Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bedke, Bell, Block, Boyle, Chadderdon(Chadderdon), Collins, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Gibbs(Wheeler), Guthrie, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Loertscher, Marriott, Moyle, Nielsen, Nonini, Patrick, Raybould, Schaefer, Simpson, Sims, Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Thompson, Wood(27), Mr. Speaker Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor
2011-04-04 PASSED
2011-04-04 Rls susp
2011-04-04 to 3rd rdg as amen
2011-04-04 2nd rdg
2011-04-01 to 2nd rdg as amen
2011-04-01 1st rdg
2011-04-01 Rpt engros
2011-03-31 to engros
2011-03-31 Rpt out amen
2011-03-30 to Gen Ord
2011-03-30 Rpt out
2011-03-22 to Jud
2011-03-22 Rpt prt
2011-03-21 to printing
2011-03-21 1st rdg
2011-03-21 House intro

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback