ID H0299 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 27, 2021 Session Law Chapter 291 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to prohibit the providing of college credit to influence a student's vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to prohibit the providing of college credit to influence a student's vote.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 27, 2021 Session Law Chapter 291 Effective: 07/01/2021
2021-04-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on April 27, 2021
2021-04-27HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2021-04-26SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2021-04-26SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2021-04-23HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2021-04-23HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2021-04-22Senateto House
2021-04-22SenateTitle apvd
2021-04-22SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 28-1-6
2021-04-22SenateRead in full as required)
2021-04-22SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2021-04-22SenateReported out without amendments; filed for second reading
2021-03-19SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2021-03-11SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2021-03-11SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-03-10Houseto Senate
2021-03-10HouseTitle apvd
2021-03-10HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 63-6-1
2021-03-10HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-03-09HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-03-08HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2021-03-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback