ID H0299 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- Appropriates $22,422,800 to the Department of Administration for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 140; provides a dedicated fund cash transfer; and directs the health insurance plan for state employees.
Title
Appropriates $22,422,800 to the Department of Administration for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 140; provides a dedicated fund cash transfer; and directs the health insurance plan for state employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/H0299/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/H0299.pdf |