ID H0296 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Returned from Governor vetoed on April 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INITIATIVES -- Revises the time and number of legislative districts within which to gather signatures for an initiative petition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises the time and number of legislative districts within which to gather signatures for an initiative petition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Governor vetoed on April 9, 2019
2019-04-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 8, 2019
2019-04-08HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-05SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-04-05SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-04-04HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-04-03HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-04-03Senateto House
2019-04-03SenateTitle apvd
2019-04-03SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 20-15-0
2019-04-03SenateRead in full as required)
2019-04-03SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-04-03SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-04-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-29Houseto Senate
2019-03-29HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-29HouseRules Suspended:
2019-03-29HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-28HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback