ID H0294 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TAXING DISTRICTS -- Amends existing law to revise the distribution of driver's license fees, to revise the sales tax distribution formula, and to revise provisions regarding the use of sales tax revenues by special purpose taxing districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the distribution of driver's license fees, to revise the sales tax distribution formula, and to revise provisions regarding the use of sales tax revenues by special purpose taxing districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseU.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
2019-04-08HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 8, 2019
2019-04-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-01HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-29HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-27HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2019-03-27HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback