ID H0294 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 04/04/2017 SECTION 4; 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 04/04/2017 SECTION 4; 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- COMMUNITY COLLEGES -- Appropriates $40,000,900 to the State Board of Education for Community Colleges for fiscal year 2018; exempts the appropriation from object and program transfer limitations; requires an update on the Complete College Idaho initiative; and appropriates an additional $1,200,000 to the College of Southern Idaho for fiscal year 2017.
Title
Appropriates $40,000,900 to the State Board of Education for Community Colleges for fiscal year 2018; exempts the appropriation from object and program transfer limitations; requires an update on the Complete College Idaho initiative; and appropriates an additional $1,200,000 to the College of Southern Idaho for fiscal year 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 04/04/2017 SECTION 4; 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS |
2017-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:17 p.m. on March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-24 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-23 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 33-1-1 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-21 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-21 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |