ID H0293 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - SECTION 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for periodic reviews of the state's public school funding formula, to provide for student enrollment counts and rulemaking, and to provide for certain reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide for periodic reviews of the state's public school funding formula, to provide for student enrollment counts and rulemaking, and to provide for certain reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseSECTION 6
2019-04-12HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter 328 Effective: 04/12/2019 SECTION 5; 07/01/2019 all other SECTIONS; 07/01/2022 Sunset Clause
2019-04-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 8, 2019
2019-04-08HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-05SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-04-05SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-04-05HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-04-04HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-04-03Senateto House
2019-04-03SenateTitle apvd
2019-04-03SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2019-04-03SenateRead in full as required)
2019-04-03SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-04-03SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-04-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2019-04-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-04-01Houseto Senate
2019-04-01HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-2-1
2019-03-29HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 1, 2019
2019-03-28HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-27HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2019-03-26HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback