ID H0291 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2019 Session Law Chapter 319 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Superintendent of Public Instruction for fiscal year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Superintendent of Public Instruction for fiscal year 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2019 Session Law Chapter 319 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 8, 2019
2019-04-08HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-05SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-04-05SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-04-04HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-04-03HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-04-03Senateto House
2019-04-03SenateTitle apvd
2019-04-03SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-04-03SenateRead in full as required)
2019-04-03SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-04-03SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-04-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-04-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2019-04-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-04-01Houseto Senate
2019-04-01HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-15-1
2019-03-29HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 1, 2019
2019-03-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-26HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback