ID H0289 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- PERMANENT BUILDING FUND -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Administration for the Division of Public Works for fiscal year 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Administration for the Division of Public Works for fiscal year 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseReturned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
2019-04-01SenateRet’d to House
2019-04-01SenateRead third time in full -- FAILED 17-18-0
2019-04-01SenateRead in full as required)
2019-04-01SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-04-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-29SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-28SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2019-03-28SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-27Houseto Senate
2019-03-27HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-27HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 60-9-1
2019-03-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-25HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback