ID H0287 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- PUBLIC SCHOOLS -- CHILDREN'S PROGRAMS DIVISION -- Appropriates $298,637,800 for the Public Schools Educational Support Program/Division of Children's Programs for fiscal year 2018; directs the use of funds for the Idaho Digital Learning Academy; directs the use of funds for the Safe and Drug-Free Schools Program; directs the use of funds for remedial coursework; directs the use of funds for limited English proficiency programs; directs the use of funds for gifted and talented students; directs the use of funds for purchasing digital content and curriculum; requires advanced opportunities reporting; directs the State Controller to transfer funds to the Commission on Hispanic Affairs; directs the State Controller to transfer funds to the Idaho State Police; provides reappropriation for certain dedicated funds; and defines the term “distributed.”
Title
Appropriates $298,637,800 for the Public Schools Educational Support Program/Division of Children's Programs for fiscal year 2018; directs the use of funds for the Idaho Digital Learning Academy; directs the use of funds for the Safe and Drug-Free Schools Program; directs the use of funds for remedial coursework; directs the use of funds for limited English proficiency programs; directs the use of funds for gifted and talented students; directs the use of funds for purchasing digital content and curriculum; requires advanced opportunities reporting; directs the State Controller to transfer funds to the Commission on Hispanic Affairs; directs the State Controller to transfer funds to the Idaho State Police; provides reappropriation for certain dedicated funds; and defines the term “distributed.”
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 -Engelking |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-1-0 |
2017-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |