ID H0286 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to education to establish provisions relating to a tax credit for contributions made to a scholarship granting organization, to establish provisions relating to the duties and responsibilities of scholarship granting organizations, to establish provisions relating to the duties and responsibilities of the State Department of Education, to establish provisions relating to the duties and responsibilities of the Idaho State Tax Commission, to provide for rules and to establish provisions relating to the duties and responsibilities of participating schools, to provide for the limitation of regulatory authority and to provide that the amount of a scholarship shall not be treated as income or as a resource for certain purposes.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to education to establish provisions relating to a tax credit for contributions made to a scholarship granting organization, to establish provisions relating to the duties and responsibilities of scholarship granting organizations, to establish provisions relating to the duties and responsibilities of the State Department of Education, to establish provisions relating to the duties and responsibilities of the Idaho State Tax Commission, to provide for rules and to establish provisions relating to the duties and responsibilities of participating schools, to provide for the limitation of regulatory authority and to provide that the amount of a scholarship shall not be treated as income or as a resource for certain purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-20 | House | PASSED -- 35-33-2 |
2013-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2013-03-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |