ID H0284 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on May 6, 2021 Session Law Chapter 310 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on May 6, 2021 Session Law Chapter 310 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- CATASTROPHIC HEALTH CARE PROGRAM -- Relates to the appropriation to the Catastrophic Health Care Program for fiscal year 2022.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Catastrophic Health Care Program for fiscal year 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on May 6, 2021 Session Law Chapter 310 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:30 p.m. on May 4, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-05-03 | Senate | to House |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-2-1 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-04-27 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-27 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 48-19-3 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 26, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 19, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 12, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-08 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |