ID H0281 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2019 Session Law Chapter 316 Effective: 04/05/2019 SECTION 1; 07/01/2019 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- Provides year-end appropriations and transfers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides year-end appropriations and transfers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2019 Session Law Chapter 316 Effective: 04/05/2019 SECTION 1; 07/01/2019 all other SECTIONS
2019-04-03HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:30 p.m. on April 2, 2019
2019-04-02HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-04-02SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-04-01HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-29HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-28Senateto House
2019-03-28SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-28SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 30-3-2
2019-03-27SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-26SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2019-03-26SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-25Houseto Senate
2019-03-25HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-25HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 55-5-10
2019-03-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-21HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-20HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback