ID H0280 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and adds to existing law relating to farm equipment to provide for the repurchase of equipment, construction equipment and repair parts for equipment; to remove certain time conditions; to provide that certain provisions shall apply to purchases by retailers from persons, firms or corporations in the business of selling or retailing farm equipment; to provide for the passage of title relating to equipment; to provide for civil liability relating to violations of specified provisions; to provide for the repurchase of equipment from heirs; to provide for liability upon failure to pay following cancellation of contracts relating to equipment; to provide that judgments may include treble damages; to provide notice requirements relating to wholesalers, manufacturers and distributors of equipment; to provide for jurisdiction and venue; to revise provisions relating to agreements between suppliers and dealers of farm equipment; to revise provisions relating to compensation for warranty claims; to provide for the sale, lease and rental of new equipment; and to provide for the use of certain dealers and to provide for dealer compensation.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law relating to farm equipment to provide for the repurchase of equipment, construction equipment and repair parts for equipment; to remove certain time conditions; to provide that certain provisions shall apply to purchases by retailers from persons, firms or corporations in the business of selling or retailing farm equipment; to provide for the passage of title relating to equipment; to provide for civil liability relating to violations of specified provisions; to provide for the repurchase of equipment from heirs; to provide for liability upon failure to pay following cancellation of contracts relating to equipment; to provide that judgments may include treble damages; to provide notice requirements relating to wholesalers, manufacturers and distributors of equipment; to provide for jurisdiction and venue; to revise provisions relating to agreements between suppliers and dealers of farm equipment; to revise provisions relating to compensation for warranty claims; to provide for the sale, lease and rental of new equipment; and to provide for the use of certain dealers and to provide for dealer compensation.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/06 | |
2011-04-06 | To Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-05 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-05 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-04 | To enrol | |
2011-04-01 | to House | |
2011-04-01 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-30 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-30 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-29 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-23 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-23 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-23 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-22 | to Senate | |
2011-03-22 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 60-7-3 | |
2011-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-18 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-17 | to Bus | |
2011-03-17 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-16 | to printing | |
2011-03-16 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-16 | House intro |