ID H0277 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MEDICAID -- Amends existing law to establish provisions regarding Medicaid, including work requirements and managed care for persons eligible for Medicaid due to Medicaid eligibility expansion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to establish provisions regarding Medicaid, including work requirements and managed care for persons eligible for Medicaid due to Medicaid eligibility expansion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2019-03-22SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-21Houseto Senate
2019-03-21HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-21HouseRules Suspended:
2019-03-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-20HouseReported out of Committee without Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-19HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-03-18HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback