ID H0277 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Attorney General to provide that certain officers may employ attorneys other than those under the supervision of the Attorney General.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Attorney General to provide that certain officers may employ attorneys other than those under the supervision of the Attorney General.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk | |
2011-04-05 | Ret'd to House | |
2011-04-05 | Fulcher | |
2011-04-05 | 11-24-0 AYES -- Bair, Brackett, Fulcher, McKague, McKenzie, Nuxoll, Pearce, Siddoway, Smyser, Toryanski, Vick NAYS -- Andreason, Bilyeu, Bock, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McGee, Mortimer, Schmidt, Stegner, Stennett, Tippets, Werk, Winder Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor | |
2011-04-05 | FAILED | |
2011-04-05 | Rls susp | |
2011-04-05 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2011-04-05 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-04 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2011-04-04 | 1st rdg | |
2011-04-04 | to 1st rdg as amen | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt out amen | |
2011-03-30 | to 14th Ord | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-28 | to St Aff | |
2011-03-28 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-28 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-25 | to Senate | |
2011-03-25 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-25 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 67-1-2 | |
2011-03-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-23 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-16 | to St Aff | |
2011-03-16 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-15 | to printing | |
2011-03-15 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-15 | House intro |