ID H0275 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2013 Session Law Chapter 349 Effective: 07/01/13 Section 1; 07/01/14 Sections 2 & 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends, repeals and adds to existing law relating to education to provide that a district may utilize up to fifteen percent of certain moneys to pay another school district or public charter school for certain services or to defray certain costs and to provide that a district may employ fewer positions than funded without a reduction in the number of funded positions being imposed; to establish provisions relating to determining a staff allowance, to establish additional conditions governing staff allowance and to provide for an appeal and a waiver.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends, repeals and adds to existing law relating to education to provide that a district may utilize up to fifteen percent of certain moneys to pay another school district or public charter school for certain services or to defray certain costs and to provide that a district may employ fewer positions than funded without a reduction in the number of funded positions being imposed; to establish provisions relating to determining a staff allowance, to establish additional conditions governing staff allowance and to provide for an appeal and a waiver.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-11HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2013 Session Law Chapter 349 Effective: 07/01/13 Section 1; 07/01/14 Sections 2 & 3
2013-04-02HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:03 p.m. on April 1, 2013
2013-04-01HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2013-03-29SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2013-03-29SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2013-03-29HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2013-03-28HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2013-03-27Senateto House
2013-03-27SenateTitle apvd
2013-03-27SenatePASSED -- 32-1-2
2013-03-27SenateRead third time in full
2013-03-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2013-03-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-03-20SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2013-03-20SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2013-03-19Houseto Senate
2013-03-19HouseTitle apvd
2013-03-19HousePASSED -- 65-5-0 -Engelking
2013-03-19HouseRead Third Time in Full
2013-03-18HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-03-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2013-03-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2013-03-11HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2013-03-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback