ID H0266 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 245 Effective: 04/04/2017 SECTION 4; 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 245 Effective: 04/04/2017 SECTION 4; 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- MEDICAL BOARDS -- Appropriates $6,709,500 to the Medical Boards for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 48.2; provides non-General Fund reappropriation for fiscal year 2018; and appropriates an additional $60,000 to the Board of Pharmacy for fiscal year 2017.
Title
Appropriates $6,709,500 to the Medical Boards for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 48.2; provides non-General Fund reappropriation for fiscal year 2018; and appropriates an additional $60,000 to the Board of Pharmacy for fiscal year 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 245 Effective: 04/04/2017 SECTION 4; 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS |
2017-03-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 27, 2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-21 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 61-9-0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |