ID H0265 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 289 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 289 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide an exemption for certain public works that have been certified by a professional engineer and does not represent a material risk to public health or safety.
Title
Amends existing law to provide an exemption for certain public works that have been certified by a professional engineer and does not represent a material risk to public health or safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 289 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:40 a.m. on April 2, 2013 |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-28 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-28 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-0-2 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-03-21 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-21 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-21 | House | Moyle |
2013-03-21 | House | 67-0-3 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Patterson, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Ward-Engelking, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Henderson, Malek, Wills Floor Sponsor |
2013-03-21 | House | PASSED |
2013-03-21 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 48 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 22, read three times |
2013-03-21 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2013-03-20 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-19 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2013-03-18 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-15 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2013-03-14 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2013-03-14 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2013-03-14 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2013-03-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |