ID H0260 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Section 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Section 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends, adds to and repeals existing law relating to Medicaid.
Title
Amends, adds to and repeals existing law relating to Medicaid.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Section 24 | |
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 164 Effective: 07/01/12 Sections 22 & 23; 07/01/11 All other sections; 07/01/12 Sunset Clause | |
2011-04-01 | Delivered to Governor on 03/31 | |
2011-03-31 | To Governor | |
2011-03-30 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-30 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-29 | To enrol | |
2011-03-28 | to House | |
2011-03-28 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-28 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 27-8-0 | |
2011-03-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-23 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-18 | to Health/Wel | |
2011-03-18 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-18 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-17 | to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-17 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 56-14-0 | |
2011-03-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-15 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-15 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-14 | to Health/Wel | |
2011-03-14 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-11 | to printing | |
2011-03-11 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-11 | House intro |