ID H0259 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2019 Session Law Chapter 320 Effective: 06/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

SALES TAX -- Amends and adds to existing law to define terms and to provide for the powers and duties of certain retailers and marketplace facilitators with regard to the collection of the state sales tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to define terms and to provide for the powers and duties of certain retailers and marketplace facilitators with regard to the collection of the state sales tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2019 Session Law Chapter 320 Effective: 06/01/2019
2019-04-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 8, 2019
2019-04-08HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-05SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-04-05SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-04-04HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-04-03Houseto enrol
2019-04-03HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-03HouseRules Suspended:
2019-04-03HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2019-04-02HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-04-02HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-04-01HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-04-01HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2019-04-01HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Revenue & Taxation for concurrence recommendation
2019-03-28HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2019-03-28Senateto House
2019-03-28SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-28SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 24-11-0
2019-03-28SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-27SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2019-03-26SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-26SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-26SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2019-03-26SenateAmendments ordered printed
2019-03-26SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-22SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2019-03-19SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-18Houseto Senate
2019-03-18HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-18HousePASSED 51-19-0
2019-03-18HouseMotion to send to Gen Ord, motion failed
2019-03-18HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders; objection
2019-03-18HouseRead Third Time in Full
2019-03-15HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 18, 2019
2019-03-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-13HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback