ID H0258 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on May 10, 2021 Session Law Chapter 335 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on May 10, 2021 Session Law Chapter 335 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ALCOHOL -- Amends existing law to provide that certain applicants shall not be deemed ineligible for a waterfront resort liquor license.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain applicants shall not be deemed ineligible for a waterfront resort liquor license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on May 10, 2021 Session Law Chapter 335 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:30 p.m. on May 4, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-05-03 | Senate | to House |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 31-2-2 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-04-06 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-06 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 64-0-6 |
2021-04-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-03-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |