ID H0255 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - U.C. to be returned to Resources & Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MINING - Amends and adds to existing law to clarify statutory authority of the Department of Lands, the Department of Water Resources and the Water Resource Board over recreational and small-scale dredge mining.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to clarify statutory authority of the Department of Lands, the Department of Water Resources and the Water Resource Board over recreational and small-scale dredge mining.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23HouseU.C. to be returned to Resources & Conservation Committee
2015-03-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 23, 2015
2015-03-19HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-03-18HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-03-12HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2015-03-11HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback