ID H0255 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 21, 2013 Session Law Chapter 126 Effective: 03/21/13 Section 1; 07/01/13 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates an additional $19,500 to the Department of Labor for fiscal year 2013; appropriates $17,273,600 to the Department of Labor for fiscal year 2014; limits the number of full-time positions to 47.04; and provides guidance for employee compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates an additional $19,500 to the Department of Labor for fiscal year 2013; appropriates $17,273,600 to the Department of Labor for fiscal year 2014; limits the number of full-time positions to 47.04; and provides guidance for employee compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-21HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 21, 2013 Session Law Chapter 126 Effective: 03/21/13 Section 1; 07/01/13 All other sections
2013-03-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 11 a.m. on March 19, 2013
2013-03-19HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2013-03-18SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2013-03-18SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2013-03-15HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2013-03-14HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2013-03-13Senateto House
2013-03-13SenateTitle apvd
2013-03-13SenatePASSED -- 31-0-4
2013-03-13SenateRead third time in full
2013-03-12SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2013-03-11SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-03-08SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2013-03-08SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2013-03-07Houseto Senate
2013-03-07HouseTitle apvd
2013-03-07HouseBolz
2013-03-07House58-7-5 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Patterson, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Ward-Engelking, Wills, Wood(27), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Bateman, Harris, McMillan, Monks, Nielsen, Sims Absent and excused -- Barrett, Boyle, DeMordaunt, Gestrin, Wood(35) Floor Sponsor
2013-03-07HousePASSED
2013-03-07HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times
2013-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2013-03-06HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback