ID H0254 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Retained on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF PARKS AND RECREATION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Parks and Recreation for fiscal year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Parks and Recreation for fiscal year 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-15SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2019-03-15SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-14Houseto Senate
2019-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 45-21-4
2019-03-13HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-12HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-11HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback