ID H0250 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 242 Effective: 04/04/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 242 Effective: 04/04/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ABORTION -- Amends existing law to remove language providing that a physician has examined in person a woman to whom an abortifacient is administered to determine the medical appropriateness of such administration and has determined that the abortifacient is sufficiently safe for use in the gestational age at which it will be administered; and to remove language providing that no drug may be prescribed through telehealth services for the purposes of causing an abortion.
Title
Amends existing law to remove language providing that a physician has examined in person a woman to whom an abortifacient is administered to determine the medical appropriateness of such administration and has determined that the abortifacient is sufficiently safe for use in the gestational age at which it will be administered; and to remove language providing that no drug may be prescribed through telehealth services for the purposes of causing an abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 242 Effective: 04/04/2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:20 a.m. on March 24, 2017 |
2017-03-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 27-7-1 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-08 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-08 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 52-18-0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |