ID H0244 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

NATUROPATHIC MEDICINE -- Establishes provisions regarding the licensure of naturopathic medical doctors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions regarding the licensure of naturopathic medical doctors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-26HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 25, 2019
2019-03-25HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-19Senateto House
2019-03-19SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-19SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-2-1
2019-03-14SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2019-03-11SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-08Houseto Senate
2019-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-3-3
2019-03-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-05HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback